Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL YEOMANRY REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 800055
Charity reporting is up to date (80 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 18 March 2022 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 18 March 2022 80 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 28 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 28 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 27 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 28 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 21 January 2018 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required