THE ROYAL YEOMANRY REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 800055
Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Astley Trustee 05 August 2020 None on record
Andrew Franklin Trustee 15 July 2021 None on record
Granville Turner Trustee 12 November 2013 None on record
Col NEWTON ASTBURY Trustee 21 January 2017
THE ARMY DEPENDANTS' TRUST Received: On time
MR CHRIS CHADWICK Trustee 19 December 2012 None on record
RICHARD MARK ALLEN Trustee 19 December 2012 None on record
SIMON MCMENEMY Trustee 24 January 2017 None on record