Financial history THE LEVY FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 800186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £3.54k £1.95k £607 £0 £100.00k
Total expenditure £80.35k £61.13k £34.91k £66.93k £51.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A