Financial history Family Holiday Charity

Charity number: 800262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.56m £1.34m £1.45m £1.91m £1.93m
Total expenditure £1.50m £1.50m £1.51m £1.50m £1.20m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.56m £1.33m £1.44m £1.90m £1.85m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.20k £3.32k £3.40k £4.75k £8.27k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £73.63k
Income - Legacies £45.86k £65.78k £161.83k £500.80k £1.09m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.12m £1.17m £1.19m £1.19m £639.20k
Expenditure - Raising funds £375.07k £333.04k £322.57k £303.30k £562.99k
Expenditure - Governance £11.37k £12.28k £7.37k £13.77k £23.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0