Governance SPECIAL OLYMPICS GREAT BRITAIN
Charity number: 800329

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 02 November 1988: Standard registration
- 09 March 2016: Funds received from 514936 SANDWELL SPECIAL OLYMPICS ASSOCIATION
- 17 March 2021: Funds received from 1047152 PUDSEY GATEWAY CLUB
- 13 September 2022: Funds received from 1171830 WHEELFEVER DANCE PROJECTS
- 27 April 2023: Funds received from 1097822 WOODFIELD AFTER SCHOOL CLUB
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- SOGB (Working name)
- SPECIAL OLYMPICS GB (Working name)
- SPECIAL OLYMPICS UK (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.