Financial history THE DIRECTORY OF SOCIAL CHANGE

Charity number: 800517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.49m £1.98m £1.88m £2.02m £1.69m
Total expenditure £2.25m £2.03m £2.05m £2.02m £1.83m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £128.01k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.50k £10.50k £6.01k £14.39k £1.25k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.49m £1.97m £1.88m £2.00m £1.56m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £215 £14 £57 £83 £29
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £128.01k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.25m £2.03m £2.05m £2.02m £1.83m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £70.21k £59.44k £65.19k £63.84k £100.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0