THE FRIENDS OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST CHURCH, BISHOPS TAWTON

Charity number: 800539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2021 01 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2020 08 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2019 12 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2018 11 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2017 13 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2017 Not Required