DEVON GARDENS TRUST

Charity number: 800540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian William Smith Trustee 09 July 2016 None on record
Shane Cormie Trustee 08 September 2018 None on record
Sarah Conibear Trustee 08 September 2018 None on record
MARION ELIZABETH KNEEBONE Trustee None on record
Susan Anne Minter Trustee 23 July 2019 None on record
Jeremy Pearson Trustee 25 July 2017 None on record
VIRGINIA ANNE PARKER BSC Hons Trustee 25 July 2017 None on record
Barbie Moul Trustee 09 July 2016 None on record
Jeryl Christine Andrew Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record