MARY RUTTLE CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 800768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 March 2021 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 02 March 2021 391 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 26 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 04 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 01 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required