Y M C A BEDFORDSHIRE

Charity number: 801035
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £2.39m £2.33m £2.79m £3.62m £3.98m
Total expenditure £2.52m £2.26m £3.12m £3.47m £3.68m
Income from government contracts £332.68k £365.48k £428.55k £482.28k £445.98k
Income from government grants £0 £19.05k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £24.22k £68.54k £16.93k £9.81k £7.46k
Income - Other trading activities £38.54k £37.11k £53.30k £56.71k £21.61k
Income - Charitable activities £2.32m £2.22m £2.71m £3.55m £3.64m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.40k £1.47k £486 £403 £387
Income - Other £0 £9.46k £10.33k £0 £15.48k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.49m £2.24m £3.10m £3.45m £3.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £17.99k £20.75k £20.25k £2.18k
Expenditure - Governance £14.00k £0 £0 £9.63k £17.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0