CHESHAM ATHLETIC FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 801127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 12 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 12 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 16 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 16 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 13 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 13 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 11 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 11 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 11 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required