CHESHAM ATHLETIC FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 801127
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £24.90k £30.31k £33.03k £35.91k £32.60k
Total expenditure £32.93k £35.77k £28.82k £31.68k £25.54k