Governing document CAT ACTION TRUST 1977
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/02/1989 AS AMENDED ON 09/10/1993 AS AMENDED ON 20/05/1995 AS AMENDED ON 28/06/1997 AS AMENDED ON 06/10/2012 as amended on 19 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING OF FERAL CATS RESIDING IN THE BRITISH ISLES WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF HOMELESSNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES, ILL-USAGE OR OTHER SIMILAR CAUSES AND TO ENCOURAGE THE PREVENTION OF UNWANTED BREEDING AMONG SUCH CATS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.