Accounts and annual returns TRAFALGAR CHRISTIAN CONGREGATION

Charity number: 801281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 11 November 2022 18 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 11 November 2021 12 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 11 November 2020 18 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 11 November 2019 02 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 11 November 2018 22 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 November 2018 Not Required