Trustees THE CITIZENSHIP FOUNDATION
Charity number: 801360
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Orla Margaret McKeon-Carter | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Asuni | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jed Cinnamon | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anushka Chakravarty | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zahra Imaan Seyyad | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Oliver Currie | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shahban Khatab Ahmed Aziz | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Matthew Ian Lambert | Trustee | 16 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacquie Anne Ayre | Trustee | 16 August 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.