CENTRAL HARDSHIP AND RELIEF TRUST

Charity number: 801465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 13 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 13 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 01 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 01 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 06 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 April 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2015 21 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 April 2016 On time Download