CENTRAL HARDSHIP AND RELIEF TRUST

Charity number: 801465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Williams Trustee 06 February 2017 None on record
KEITH COLDRICK Trustee 10 August 2012 None on record
TIMOTHY JAMES POCOCK Trustee 16 June 2006
THE LONG LEYS EDUCATION TRUST Received: On time
J S TEISSONNIERE ESQ Trustee 16 June 2006 None on record
CHARLES CAMPBELL Trustee 10 August 2012 None on record
MARK JOHN HOBBS Trustee 16 June 2006 None on record
TIMOTHY WYATT BARTER Trustee 16 January 2004
THISTLEDOWN EDUCATION TRUST Received: On time
IVEL GOSPEL HALL TRUST Received: On time
THE TMT FOUNDATION Received: On time
SIMON RICH Trustee 10 August 2012 None on record
MARCUS TURNER Trustee 10 August 2012 None on record
RICHARD HENRY LYNES Chair 03 February 1989 None on record