Financial history SOUTHWARK DISABLEMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 801594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £963.20k £967.64k £1.07m £1.21m £1.31m
Total expenditure £972.42k £1.00m £1.07m £1.20m £1.24m
Income from government contracts £774.88k £333.41k £613.90k £948.91k £1.10m
Income from government grants £80.36k £80.00k £80.00k £124.27k £155.02k
Income - Donations and legacies £114.86k £87.46k £80.14k £143.98k £155.14k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £848.01k £879.71k £994.36k £1.07m £1.16m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £338 £474 £151 £32 £11
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £972.42k £1.00m £1.07m £1.20m £1.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.78k £17.04k £15.51k £14.44k £14.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0