Financial history WOKING HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 801665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022
Total gross income £2.03k £1.67k £1.63k £856 £1.59k
Total expenditure £2.06k £1.96k £1.11k £719 £1.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A