Trustees INFORMATION NETWORK FOCUS ON RELIGIOUS MOVEMENTS
Charity number: 801729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR KIM KNOTT | Chair | 05 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jasjit Singh | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Rabbi Charlotte Baginsky | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Prof Humeira Iqtidar | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amma Anane-Agyei | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Toby Lees | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Mark Hill QC | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Patrick Hollinghurst | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|||||
DR George Chryssides PhD | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR Graham Harvey PhD | Trustee | 08 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
The Reverend Alan Robert Walker | Trustee |
|
||||||
REV A MAGUIRE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr MARAT SHTERIN PHD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.