THE AGNES POULTON CHARITY

Charity number: 801788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.67k £9.60k £9.64k £10.55k £9.60k
Total expenditure £8.68k £6.56k £9.47k £6.14k £6.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A