THE SOCIETY OF THE WORK

Charity number: 802099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £44.81k £62.03k £38.98k £313.41k £40.67k
Total expenditure £39.52k £48.66k £42.24k £69.03k £65.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A