Trustees THE GERRY HOLDSWORTH SPECIAL FORCES CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 802124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony James Moxon Lowther-Pinkerton LVO MBE | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|||||||
John Raine CMG OBE | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|||||||
Sir Hew Strachen DL FRSE | Trustee | 06 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||
General Sir MARK CARLETON-SMITH GCB CBE | Trustee | 29 June 2012 |
|
|||||||
SUSAN MARY RICHARDS | Trustee | 13 July 2011 |
|
|||||||
Lady Victoria Getty | Trustee | 13 July 2011 |
|
|||||||
SIR ROBERT CRAWFORD CBE | Trustee | 13 July 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.