RURAL MISSION SOLUTIONS LTD

Charity number: 802305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £11.28k £8.03k £8.24k £5.05k £6.53k
Total expenditure £8.07k £6.79k £5.82k £4.58k £5.33k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A