GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST CHARALAMBOUS

Charity number: 802532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £110.79k £78.49k £97.03k £90.39k £44.74k
Total expenditure £56.02k £45.24k £50.97k £50.06k £41.37k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A