ST ANNE'S ASSOCIATION OF PARENTS AND TEACHERS

Charity number: 802786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £23.07k £23.85k £24.66k £24.83k £9.33k
Total expenditure £18.97k £1.79k £16.94k £16.16k £7.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A