THE J J WIX CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 802793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.43k £6.68k £9.24k £22.11k £22.66k
Total expenditure £8.88k £10.20k £13.10k £15.30k £7.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A