Financial history THE WILLIAM HARVEY RESEARCH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 803012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.62m £1.47m £1.46m £1.13m £1.66m
Total expenditure £1.79m £1.44m £1.47m £1.14m £1.58m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £18.23k £30.40k £29.81k £125.89k £109.25k
Income - Other trading activities £1.38m £1.20m £1.35m £877.38k £1.52m
Income - Charitable activities £220.97k £241.58k £75.41k £119.15k £31.99k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.08k £3.94k £3.87k £1.24k £776
Income - Other £2.45k £0 £575 £8.70k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.50m £1.12m £1.16m £929.29k £1.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £287.59k £315.74k £309.56k £214.35k £268.69k
Expenditure - Governance £37.60k £40.27k £26.31k £34.70k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.38m £998.04k £1.10m £874.00k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0