BRADWELL-ON-SEA VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 803054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Krysta Collins Trustee 23 July 2019 None on record
JEAN ALLEN Trustee 28 January 2021
MARY BROWN TRUST Received: On time
KAREN WYATT Trustee None on record
Marie Faulkard Trustee 11 June 2018 None on record
MR W HIRON Trustee None on record
Peter Davidson Trustee 06 June 2019 None on record
Mr R A Scurrell Trustee 11 May 2017 None on record
Mrs T King Trustee 11 May 2016 None on record
SUSAN SPIERS Trustee None on record
Jennavive Bennett Trustee 28 January 2021 None on record
Lynn Roughley Trustee 23 July 2019 None on record
Jean Meehan Trustee 23 July 2019 None on record