FOREST YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF EAST LONDON

Charity number: 803442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.12m £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £5.78m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £15.07k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £63.05k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £5.86m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £185.83k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.75m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £37.90k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £170.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A