Financial history YMCA West Kent

Charity number: 803529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.63m £1.46m £1.30m £1.35m £1.28m
Total expenditure £1.22m £1.36m £1.52m £1.41m £1.30m
Income from government contracts £436.08k £582.39k £325.00k £240.00k £250.00k
Income from government grants £4.83k N/A N/A N/A £187.18k
Income - Donations and legacies £39.43k £159.98k £47.41k £122.16k £326.57k
Income - Other trading activities £188.22k £245.48k £231.29k £225.84k £76.61k
Income - Charitable activities £997.23k £1.06m £1.02m £999.39k £875.85k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £12.16k £0
Income - Investment £7.19k £175 £409 £0 £69
Income - Other £400.00k £0 £0 £1.50k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £150.12k £0 £110.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.05m £1.13m £1.32m £1.19m £1.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £169.43k £228.21k £195.93k £214.41k £204.24k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £15.15k £10.00k £0 £16.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £20