Financial history WORLDSHARE

Charity number: 803575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £454.42k £481.11k £463.00k £371.35k £462.24k
Total expenditure £472.20k £462.23k £518.44k £370.35k £434.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A