Accounts and annual returns MOOR MEADOW CHARITY

Charity number: 810353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required