BODY POSITIVE DORSET

Charity number: 900089
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 13 September 2016 On time Download