THE FRIENDS OF SAINT GREGORY'S CATHOLIC COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL ENRICHMENT FUND

Charity number: 900124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £4.36k £2.79k £1.31k £837 £639
Total expenditure £22.45k £2.45k £8.31k £4.98k £20.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A