Accounts and annual returns THE NEW COLLEGE DEVELOPMENT FUND

Charity number: 900202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 25 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 25 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 15 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 01 July 2020 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 29 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 29 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required