Financial history THE NEW COLLEGE DEVELOPMENT FUND

Charity number: 900202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £0 £5.00k £0 £224 £28.17k
Total expenditure £26.49m £169.76k £15.00k £45.03k £28.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A