Financial history THE OCTOBER CLUB

Charity number: 900331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £63.74k £87.26k £90.25k £64.58k £60.99k
Total expenditure £49.00k £76.02k £85.47k £98.78k £67.27k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £27.83k £25.60k £20.00k £17.00k £20.27k