BLACK ELDERS DAY CENTRE OF GLOUCESTER

Charity number: 900388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £45.13k £48.77k £47.64k £47.64k £48.13k
Total expenditure £39.26k £39.35k £44.36k £88.13k £53.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £2.23k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £34.00k £18.50k £36.42k £34.00k £36.29k