Accounts and annual returns THE BRADFIELD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 900457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 11 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 06 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 11 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window