Accounts and annual returns PETERSFIELD MUSICAL FESTIVAL

Charity number: 900489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2022 20 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 20 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 20 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 07 May 2021 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 07 May 2021 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 25 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 25 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window