Financial history PETERSFIELD MUSICAL FESTIVAL

Charity number: 900489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £44.06k £48.25k £25.26k £4.78k £41.95k
Total expenditure £40.38k £45.65k £35.88k £2.84k £40.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.80k £2.00k £2.05k N/A £6.00k