Financial history FRIENDS OF BOURTON SCHOOL

Charity number: 900503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £7.04k £9.41k £6.17k £1.94k £11.99k
Total expenditure £4.16k £5.60k £8.44k £9.34k £6.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A