PORTHLEVEN TOWN BAND

Charity number: 900529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £13.59k £15.16k £20.88k £22.25k £20.19k
Total expenditure £29.64k £29.42k £31.99k £20.52k £49.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A