EXMOOR SINGERS

Charity number: 900587
Charity reporting is overdue by 1517 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2011 30/09/2012 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015
Total gross income £16.90k £8.37k £17.78k £14.54k £19.10k
Total expenditure £20.90k £11.06k £20.61k £20.13k £18.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0