CHARITY OF HUMPHREY CHILTON HOWARD FRANCIS

Charity number: 900641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £17.60k £14.91k £18.10k £18.49k £18.95k
Total expenditure £17.58k £15.35k £17.31k £17.68k £17.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A