TRUST DEED DATED 12/06/1946
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09/03/1979
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15/09/1997
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07/07/2003
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/04/2005
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21 MAR 2018
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21 FEB 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM PARAPLEGIA AND/OR SEVERE DISABILITY, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED IN THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN.