SOCIETY FOR COMPUTING AND TECHNOLOGY IN ANAESTHESIA

Charity number: 1002231
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 29 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 24 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 31 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 18 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2015 21 September 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)