FANCONI HOPE

Charity number: 1126894
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 17 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 17 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 13 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 21 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017

( These accounts
have been qualified)

21 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 17 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2015 05 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)