NILE SWIMMERS

Charity number: 1152395
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 10 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 07 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 09 October 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 05 January 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 05 January 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)